U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:17-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 31, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.