U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00045-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Harrell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order to Show Cause]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.