U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCCOY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 05, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.