U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GRISWALD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 28, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.