U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 04, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • February 04, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 09, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • December 02, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2018: [Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 16, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 13, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 02, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 01, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.