U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALLRIDGE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 19, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 15, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.