U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00028-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FALCON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 24, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Produce]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.