U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.