U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-00078-4
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WOMBLE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.