U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00034-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CAMPBELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 17, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 03, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.