U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOYD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.