U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. NORRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 13, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • January 04, 2018: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.