U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:17-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DENSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 27, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.