U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00082-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITEHURST
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 01, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.