U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JONES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Amended Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.