U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITFIELD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2018: [Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.