U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 30, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 11, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.