U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-12203
  • Case Name: Corey Milsap
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor and Closing Estate (182)]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [01-Order Discharging Ch. 7 Debtor and Closing Estate]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of US Trustee's Notice of Presumed Abuse]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Supplemental Statement Presumed Abuse]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Statement of Intent]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income/Means Test Document(s) - (Forms 122A-1, 122A-1Supp, 122A-2)]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Schedule A/B]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Discovery Request]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [06-Motion to Extend Time]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Hearing]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [05-Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [06-Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Abandonment (556)]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [05-Trustees Interim Report]
  • April 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Notice of Abandonment of Property]
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Status Report]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Extend Time, Motion to]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of U.S. Trustee's Statement Under 704(b)(2)]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Stipulation]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [U.S. Trustees Statement and Notice of No Means Testing Documents Filed]
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Order re: request for 521 dismissal]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [06-Trustees Status Report (INDIVIDUAL)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of US Trustee's No Determ. of Abuse]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408)]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [0-Reaffirmation Agreement -- (No Undue Hardship)]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [07-Application to Employ]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [06-Motion to Extend Time]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [U.S. Trustees Statement of Inability to Determine Presumed Abuse]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • January 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income/Means Test Document(s) - (Forms 122A-1, 122A-1Supp, 122A-2)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Schedule J]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [P-Schedule I]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees]
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • October 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Howell, Griffin E. [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.