U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:92-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Holmes et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • April 29, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.