U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BELT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.