U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HALL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 22, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.