U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:17-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WALKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.