U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:17-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOLLIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.