U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PRUITT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 10, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 29, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.