U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-mj-00056-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHITLOCK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order]
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.