U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COBB
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.