U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00058-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COWART et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Judgment]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 14, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.