U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BURNHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order]
  • September 11, 2018: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Acquittal]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.