U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order]
  • July 13, 2018: [Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.