U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SIMMONS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 24, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.