U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-mj-00130-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. VASQUEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.