U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MURPHY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.