U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-mc-00003
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FPS INDUSTRIES GLOBAL LLC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time (Misc)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.