U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:12-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRITT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order of Detention]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 23, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Order]
  • February 28, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.