U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KORONA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.