U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MEEKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Order of Commitment]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.