U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PATE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Revocation of Pretrial Release]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.