U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WALKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.