U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LEWIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order]
  • February 02, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.