U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 12, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2018
  • December 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.