U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. QUARLES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 16, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.