U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCKENZIE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Judgment]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • July 03, 2019: [Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • June 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Travel]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.