U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARDIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2020
  • June 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 23, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 16, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.