U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-00013-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BLANKENSHIP et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.