U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALFORD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Departure]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 16, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.