U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PERSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.