U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00004-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WISE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • March 13, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.