U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00013-5
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GONZALEZ-PINEDA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 06, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.