U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PARKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 07, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.