U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.